+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 12, 2008 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On August 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 047-000-003
- Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions August 12, 2008
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 094-008-006
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
+ − Votes (2)
August 12, 2008: HJR0132 - Motion To Adopt - Tuesday, August 12, 2008
May 7, 2008: HJR0132 - Wednesday, May 07, 2008
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor