+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor