+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Arrive in Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 118-000-000
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Removed from Resolution Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin