+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On January 6, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson