+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor