+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On July 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste