+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 026-000-000
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
+ − Vote
May 18, 2016: HR1199 - Elem Sec Ed School Curricu Policies
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor