+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor