+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 101-005-000
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks