+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie