+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 059-045-000
- Shall the Chair be Sustained
- Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Ronald A. Wait
- Motion Discharge Committee Lost
- Moves to Discharge Committee - Rep. Ron Wait
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Vote
May 6, 2008: HJR0118 - Tuesday, May 06, 2008
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor