+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2010 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
+ − Vote
May 4, 2010: HR1156 - Tuesday, May 04, 2010
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor