+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg