+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 006-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer
+ − Vote
May 14, 2008: HR1117 - Wednesday, May 14, 2008
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor