+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 27, 2010 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2010
- Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Motion Prevailed 046-000-000
- Senator Harmon - Request a Roll Call on Senator Althoff's Motion to Wative the Posting Notice.
- Assigned to Executive
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 3, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. William D. Burns
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 113-000-000
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns