+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 005-004-000
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Vote
April 19, 2016: HR1092 - International Trade & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor