+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays