+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
+ − Vote
October 28, 2019: HR0109 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor