+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios