+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2008
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 106-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ron Stephens
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2008: HJR0107 - Motion To Adopt - Wednesday, May 28, 2008
May 1, 2008: HJR0107 - Thursday, May 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor