+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 100-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-001-000
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Resolves that the community colleges of the State are entitled to reimbursement for the costs incurred in the administration of the Illinois Veteran Grant Program, the Illinois National Guard Grant Program, and the MIA-POW Scholarship Program in the past fiscal years and that the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board conduct a joint study detailing the amount of tuition and fees each community college has waived over the last four fiscal years to compensate for the lack of funding in the Governor's budgets for the grant and scholarship programs.
+ − Vote
April 18, 2006: HR1039 - Tuesday, April 18, 2006
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor