+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: HR1021 - Labor & Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor