+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 019-000-000
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M Gordon
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Co-Sponsor Rep. George Scully, Jr.
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor