+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 075-034-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On May 31, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Vote
June 1, 2004: HR1007 - Tuesday, June 01, 2004
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor