+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 012-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor