+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 109-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Vote
May 22, 2008: HJR0100 - Thursday, May 22, 2008
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor