+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Economic Development & Housing Committee; 011-000-000
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development & Housing Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay