+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens
+ − Vote
April 14, 2011: HJR0001 - Thursday, April 14, 2011
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor