+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 051-000-000
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 113-000-000
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Disability Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Disability Services Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Disability Services Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything with substantially similar provisions, except: (1) changes the entities who will appoint the non-legislative members of the task force; and (2) provides that the Illinois State Board of Education, the Illinois Department of Human Services, and the Illinois Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission shall collectively administer and prepare all reports deemed necessary in conjunction with the task force actively.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2007: HJR0001 - Motion To Adopt - Friday, May 18, 2007
April 19, 2007: HJR0001 - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor