+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-018-002
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Read in Full a Third Time
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- (M1) Motion to Suspend Rule 21 and Rule 46 - Prevailed
- (M1) Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee and Rule 46: Representative Jack Franks
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
December 1, 2016: HJRCA0062 - Amendment
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor