+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Third Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 21, 2016: HJRCA0059 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor