+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments Affecting the Judiciary
- To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments Affecting the Judiciary
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-007-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Third Time - As Amended
- 3/5 Vote Required
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Second Time - As Amended
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a First Time - As Amended
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a First Time - As Amended (CORRECTED)
- Recalled to the Order of First Reading
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Filed Rep. Jack D. Franks; In accordance with House Rule 25, I move to suspend the posting requirements of House Rule 21 so that HJRCA 58 may be heard in the Executive Committee at its next meeting.
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the heading with provisions of the Resolution as amended by House Amendment 2 with the following changes: Changes the public notice period for meetings of the Independent Redistricting Commission to 7 days (now 5 days). Adds a requirement that at least 5 of the 15 required public hearings must be held after the Commission releases any proposed redistricting plan. Provides that the Commission cannot vote to approve a proposed redistricting plan until at least 7 days after the release of the proposed redistricting plan.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2016: HJRCA0058 - Sub Com on CA Affecting the Jud
May 3, 2016: HJRCA0058 - Amendment
April 18, 2016: HJRCA0058 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor