+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Postponed - Executive
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-010-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Third Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2016: SCA0001 - Executive
April 22, 2016: HJRCA0005 - Amendment
April 13, 2016: HJRCA0005 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor