+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Read in Full a Third Time
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2016
- Read in Full a Second Time
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016
- Read in Full a First Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2016
- Be Adopted Executive; 015-000-000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-004-002
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Read in Full a Third Time - As Amended
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Second Time - As Amended
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to the Order of First Reading
- Read in Full a First Time - As Amended
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Third Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 019-000-000
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the heading. Reinserts the provisions of the House Joint Resolution Constitutional Amendment as introduced, and makes changes. Modifies the list of subject matter for direct program expenses to which the costs of administering laws related to vehicles and transportation shall be limited, and removes the Secretary of State, the Department of State Police, and the Department of Transportation, or their successor agencies, from the relevant provisions. Provides that if the General Assembly appropriates funds for a mode of transportation not described, the General Assembly must provide for a dedicated source of funding. Changes all references of "public highways" to "highways". Makes formatting changes.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 5, 2016: HJRCA0036 - Third Reading
May 3, 2016: HJRCA0036 - Executive
April 22, 2016: HJRCA0036 - Amendment
April 12, 2016: HJRCA0036 - Transportation, Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor