+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-006-001
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-002-000
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor