+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 068-047-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Third Time
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-005-000
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: HJRCA0026 - Amendment
May 20, 2015: HJRCA0026 - Revenue & Finance - May 20, 2015
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor