+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
- Arrive in Senate
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2018: HJR0099
April 17, 2018: HJR0099 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor