+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On October 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Arrive in Senate
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst