+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 007-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
+ − Vote
May 30, 2019: HJR0081 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor