+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 8, 2014
- Be Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 106-000-000
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Meier
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2014: HJR0074 - Motion To Adopt - Thursday, May 15, 2014
April 7, 2014: HJR0074 - Monday, April 07, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor