+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Resolution Adopted; 050-000-000
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions August 4, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 109-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Makes corrections.