+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 8, 2014
- Be Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2014: HJR0060 - Motion To Adopt - Friday, May 23, 2014
April 10, 2014: HJR0060 - Thursday, April 10, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor