+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-005-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: HJR0054 - Elem Sec Ed School Curricu Policies - Apr 29, 2015
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor