+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: HJR0038 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor