+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke