+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
+ − Vote
March 30, 2017: HJR0032 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor