+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
- Arrive in Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2021: HJR0031 - Motion To Adopt
May 5, 2021: HJR0031
April 27, 2021: HJR0031 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor