+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 067-029-000
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-002-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2019: HJR0027
March 20, 2019: HJR0027 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor