+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 105-000-000
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2015: HJR0027 - Friday, April 17, 2015
March 19, 2015: HJR0027 - Veterans' Affairs - Mar 19, 2015
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor