+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor